This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 08:03:09 (UTC).

EDREN BARTLEY VS INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 EDREN BARTLEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1741

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARTLEY EDREN

Defendant

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/21/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/21/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/21/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/9/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/9/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/09/2023

2/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/09/2023

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/9/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/09/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Edren Bartley on 12/21/2022 as follows: Defendant Inglewood Unified School District does not owe the plaintiff Edren Bartley any money on plaintiff's claim.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Edren Bartley (Plaintiff); As to: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Edren Bartley (Plaintiff); As to: Inglewood Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David K. Reinert in Department 1 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less