This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2022 at 14:36:48 (UTC).

ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT VS JASBIR SINGH CHAHAL

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASBIR SINGH CHAHAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2690

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT

Defendant

CHAHAL JASBIR SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/17/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/17/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

7/12/2022: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAffidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE; Filed by: ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT (Plaintiff); As to: JASBIR SINGH CHAHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT (Plaintiff); As to: JASBIR SINGH CHAHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ECOLE D HUMANITE GENOSSENSCHAFT (Plaintiff); As to: JASBIR SINGH CHAHAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V