This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 15:37:17 (UTC).

DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC VS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3426

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC DBA DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHN JONATHON E.

Defendant Attorney

SCHOELL COLIN DARAGH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/30/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/30/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

6/23/2021: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

General Denial - General Denial

6/17/2021: General Denial - General Denial

Notice (name extension) - Notice Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

8/6/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2024
  • Hearing05/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant