This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 02:36:23 (UTC).

DONALD STERLING HODGE VS IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 DONALD STERLING HODGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6235

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HODGE DONALD STERLING

Defendants

IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/25/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/25/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/25/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

8/25/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/25/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Re Venue

9/20/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Re Venue

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

10/28/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2024
  • Hearing08/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff); As to: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); Service Date: 09/29/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff); As to: IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2021; Service Cost: 107.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff); As to: M&N FINANCING CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2021; Service Cost: 107.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); As to: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Re Venue; Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff); As to: IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); M&N FINANCING CORPORATION (Defendant); HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff); As to: IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); M&N FINANCING CORPORATION (Defendant); HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Donald Sterling Hodge (Plaintiff); As to: IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); M&N FINANCING CORPORATION (Defendant); HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN