This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2021 at 13:23:51 (UTC).

DONALD FORSYTHE, JR. VS ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 DONALD FORSYTHE, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2748

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORSYTHE DONALD JR.

Defendant

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANKIN LEE ESQ.

DAHL NICHOLAS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/8/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Donald Forsythe, JR. on 04/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Donald Forsythe, JR. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAddress for Lee Mankin, Esq. (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Donald Forsythe, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Donald Forsythe, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Donald Forsythe, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Donald Forsythe, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANKIN LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAHL NICHOLAS