This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 12:06:05 (UTC).

DNF ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ERICK SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 DNF ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERICK SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2969

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

SMITH ERICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/29/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/29/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/3/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF NON SERVICE

1/27/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF NON SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF NON SERVICE; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Smith (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/17/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less