This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 19:41:23 (UTC).

DNF ASSOCIATES, LLC VS ERICK CONTRERAS

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 DNF ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERICK CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8020

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CONTRERAS ERICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES III

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/2/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/2/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/2/2022: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Contreras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Contreras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DNF Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erick Contreras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DNF ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES