This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 00:17:01 (UTC).

DMITRY MAGIDIN VS ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 DMITRY MAGIDIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1358

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGIDIN DMITRY

Defendant

ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/7/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

7/7/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/7/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/19/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/27/2021

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/27/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

9/27/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department P at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/10/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dmitry Magidin (Plaintiff); As to: All State Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dmitry Magidin (Plaintiff); As to: All State Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from All State Insurance Company (Defendant) to All State Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from All State Insurance Company (Defendant) to All State Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/27/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL STATE INSURANCE is a litigant