This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 06:53:22 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SERGEY HAMBARDZUMYAN

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERGEY HAMBARDZUMYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0670

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HAMBARDZUMYAN SERGEY

Granada Hills, CA 91344-7032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/14/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/28/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment .

3/28/2022: Judgment - Judgment .

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of default judgment

3/28/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of default judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketJudgment . Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in support of default judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Sergey Hambardzumyan; On the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 01/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Discover Bank against Defendant Sergey Hambardzumyan on the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 01/10/2022 for the principal amount of $3,510.32 and costs of $336.53 for a total of $3,846.85.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/22/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergey Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bernie C. LaForteza in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELMASSIAN BRIANNA