This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 20:36:50 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS NONE HENRY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NONE HENRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1720

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HENRY NONE

Rosemead, CA 91770-2369

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATE SHANE T

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

11/23/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

12/3/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: NONE HENRY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: NONE HENRY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: NONE HENRY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wate, Shane Thomas