This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 21:28:18 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS NGOZI B OGBENI

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NGOZI B OGBENI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0781

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

OGBENI NGOZI B

Altadena, CA 91001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBOURN THOMAS J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of calculation of accrued interest

1/12/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in support of calculation of accrued interest

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/12/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of non-military service

1/12/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of non-military service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

1/12/2022: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration pursuant to code 1033

1/12/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration pursuant to code 1033

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration pursuant to code 1033; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of non-military service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ngozi B Ogbeni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in support of calculation of accrued interest; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ngozi B Ogbeni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Ngozi B Ogbeni; On the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Discover Bank against Defendant Ngozi B Ogbeni on the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 11/24/2021 for the principal amount of $1,578.46 and costs of $294.50 for a total of $1,872.96.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ngozi B Ogbeni (Defendant); Service Date: 12/03/2021; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ngozi B Ogbeni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ngozi B Ogbeni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Ngozi B Ogbeni (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sebourn, Thomas J.