This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 11:22:35 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS JUDITH KALMUS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUDITH KALMUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2708

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KALMUS JUDITH

Los Angeles, CA 90046-1606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELMASSIAN BRIANNA

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/2/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

2/2/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/2/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/2/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/6/2023: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/7/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 02/02/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Discover Bank as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant); Service Date: 02/06/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Judith Kalmus (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less