*******2713
02/02/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Los Angeles, California
TRICIA TAYLOR
DISCOVER BANK
KIM JIHEE
Temple City, CA 91780-2853
ELMASSIAN BRIANNA
2/2/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue
2/2/2023: Complaint - Complaint
2/2/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint
2/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
2/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
2/2/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
2/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Hearing02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jihee Kim (Defendant); Service Date: 02/18/2023; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jihee Kim (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jihee Kim (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jihee Kim (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Jihee Kim (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse
[-] Read Less