This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 13:10:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CHRISTINA VERDINES

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTINA VERDINES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9949

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

VERDINES CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

12/14/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Complaint - Complaint

12/14/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/14/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/14/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

3/1/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/1/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

3/2/2023: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Discover Bank against Defendant Christina Verdines on the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 12/14/2022 for the principal amount of $6,420.95 and costs of $317.79 for a total of $6,738.74.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Christina Verdines; On the Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Discover Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Christina Verdines (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less