This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 10:56:34 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA-PRODUCER HEALTH PLAN, ET AL. VS LOCK THE DOOR LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA-PRODUCER HEALTH PLAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOCK THE DOOR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7577

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA-PRODUCER HEALTH PLAN

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA-PRODUCER PENSION PLANS

Defendants

LOCK THE DOOR LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CLEAR HORIZON ENTERTAINMENT LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORHEAD J. PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/20/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/20/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

10/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/20/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/21/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/5/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/5/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/5/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company; Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; On the Complaint filed by Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan, et al. on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/25/2021; Service Cost: 133.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America-Producer Health Plan (Plaintiff); Directors Guild of America-Producer Pension Plans (Plaintiff); As to: Lock The Door LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Clear Horizon Entertainment, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORHEAD J. PAUL ESQ.