This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:32:54 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC. VS WINNING SEASON LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against WINNING SEASON LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC.

Respondent

WINNING SEASON LLC A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

1/28/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/28/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

1/28/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/11/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/24/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

7/8/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award

7/7/2021: Judgment - Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/11/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment Confirming Arbitration Award; Signed and Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award: Result Date changed from 06/22/2021 to 07/07/2021; As To Parties changed from Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent) to Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc. against Respondent Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company on the Petition filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc. on 01/28/2021 for the principal amount of $7,785.35, damages of $6,519.73, and other $2,500.00 for a total of $16,805.08. Cost to be determined per filing of Memorandum of Costs.; Other: Other: $2,500 is for Arbitrator's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award: Result Date: 06/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/03/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Winning Season LLC, a New York limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM MICHELLE