This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 12:14:14 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS SINO AMERICAN FILM COMPANY LIMITED, A HONG KONG COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against SINO AMERICAN FILM COMPANY LIMITED, A HONG KONG COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2680

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Respondent

SINO AMERICAN FILM COMPANY LIMITED A HONG KONG COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOLDFARB KIMBERLY J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/18/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/18/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/18/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Petition (name extension) - Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment In Conformity Therewith

8/18/2021: Petition (name extension) - Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment In Conformity Therewith

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/18/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/19/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

12/23/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Proposed Confirming Arbitration Award

12/22/2021: Judgment - Judgment Proposed Confirming Arbitration Award

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and...)

12/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

12/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/4/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment In Conformity Therewith: Filed By: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation against Respondent Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company on the Petition filed by Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation on 08/18/2021 for the principal amount of $5,195.53 and damages of $422.75 for a total of $5,618.28. Cost to be determined per filing of Memorandum of Costs.; Other: $422.75 IN LATE CHARGES AS OF MARCH 19, 2021, WHICH CONTINUE TO ACCRUE AT $1.51 PER DAY THEREAFTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed Confirming Arbitration Award: Status Date changed from 12/22/2021 to 12/22/2021; Result Date changed from 12/22/2021 to 12/22/2021; As To Parties changed from Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent) to Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment In Conformity Therewith scheduled for 12/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 12/22/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment Proposed Confirming Arbitration Award; Signed and Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed Confirming Arbitration Award: Filed By: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPetition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment In Conformity Therewith; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: Sino American Film Company Limited, a Hong Kong company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition For Confirmation of Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment In Conformity Therewith scheduled for 12/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDFARB KIMBERLY J.