This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 01:47:09 (UTC).

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION VS 3 AMIGOS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against 3 AMIGOS PRODUCTIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2380

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Respondent

3 AMIGOS PRODUCTIONS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOLDFARB KIMBERLY J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/23/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/22/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/22/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

7/22/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/22/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/22/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/10/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/10/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: 3 Amigos Productions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: 3 Amigos Productions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: 3 Amigos Productions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: 3 Amigos Productions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Directors Guild of America, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); As to: 3 Amigos Productions, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTORS GUILD OF AMERICA is a litigant