This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 07:34:39 (UTC).

DIANE DAVIS VS LESLIE'S POOLMART, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 DIANE DAVIS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LESLIE'S POOLMART, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1109

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS DIANE

Defendant

LESLIE'S POOLMART INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDSON PERRIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/8/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Diane Davis on 02/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Diane Davis as to LESLIE'S POOLMART, INC, a Delaware Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Diane Davis (Plaintiff); As to: LESLIE'S POOLMART, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diane Davis (Plaintiff); As to: LESLIE'S POOLMART, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Diane Davis (Plaintiff); As to: LESLIE'S POOLMART, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LESLIES POOLMART INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON PERRIN