This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 09:40:40 (UTC).

DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, VS RICHARD M. TORRES

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARD M TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6921

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendant

TORRES RICHARD M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/18/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/18/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/18/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/18/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/14/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, on 10/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD M. TORRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD M. TORRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD M. TORRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIAMOND BAR TENNIS CLUB COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD M. TORRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less