This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 01:13:35 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0118

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/6/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/6/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/6/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/2/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/8/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Department of Water and Power of the City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Department of Water and Power of the City of Los Angeles on 01/06/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Department of Water and Power of the City of Los Angeles as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Department of Water and Power of the City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Department of Water and Power of the City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); As to: HP Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less