This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 01:23:09 (UTC).

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES VS SAEEDREZA HAFEZNEZAMI

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 DENNIS P BLOCK ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAEEDREZA HAFEZNEZAMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0837

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Defendant

HAFEZNEZAMI SAEEDREZA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

5/4/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/4/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/4/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/13/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/08/2021

7/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/08/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 07/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES on 05/04/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES (Plaintiff); As to: SAEEDREZA HAFEZNEZAMI (Defendant); Service Cost: 57.99; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES (Plaintiff); As to: SAEEDREZA HAFEZNEZAMI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES is a litigant