This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 17:16:44 (UTC).

DELIA GARCIA VS ALLIED UNIVERSAL JANITORIAL SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 DELIA GARCIA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ALLIED UNIVERSAL JANITORIAL SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3202

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA DELIA

Defendant

ALLIED UNIVERSAL JANITORIAL SERVICES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/29/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/29/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/29/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Judgment - Judgment

8/30/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

8/29/2022: Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Delia Garcia against Defendant Allied Universal Janitorial Services, LLC, a Limited Liability Company on the Petition filed by Delia Garcia on 08/29/2022 for the principal amount of $3,335.50, interest of $14.83, and costs of $250.00 for a total of $3,600.33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David J. Cowan in Department 1 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Delia Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Allied Universal Janitorial Services, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: Delia Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Allied Universal Janitorial Services, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less