Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 05:56:55 (UTC).

DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS FRENIE EVIDENTE

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRENIE EVIDENTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2316

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

EVIDENTE FRENIE AKA FRENIE P. EVIDENTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN JOHN P.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/10/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

5/10/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: FRENIE EVIDENTE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: FRENIE EVIDENTE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/23/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: FRENIE EVIDENTE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: FRENIE EVIDENTE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DEBT MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC , A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: FRENIE EVIDENTE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenosian, John P