This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 03:05:50 (UTC).

DEA HACKETT VS HAVEN BROWN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 DEA HACKETT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAVEN BROWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7163

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HACKETT DEA

Defendant

BROWN HAVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUNDY ALBRO L

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER STEVEN K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/28/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/28/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/28/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/28/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/28/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Steven K. Alexander Re: Meet and Confer

12/20/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Steven K. Alexander Re: Meet and Confer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike TO COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2025
  • Hearing10/31/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2024
  • Hearing04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: Haven Brown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Steven K. Alexander Re: Meet and Confer; Filed by: Haven Brown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Dea Hackett (Plaintiff); As to: Haven Brown (Defendant); Service Cost: 132.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dea Hackett (Plaintiff); As to: Haven Brown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dea Hackett (Plaintiff); As to: Haven Brown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dea Hackett (Plaintiff); As to: Haven Brown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/31/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less