This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 07:59:47 (UTC).

DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS WENDY CHAN

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 DDS WOOD WORKING, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WENDY CHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1114

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

DDS WOOD WORKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHAN WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OPERINI EDWARD G

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BACIO GARY A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/9/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/9/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons Cross-Complaint

8/5/2021: Summons - Summons Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

8/5/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

8/3/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

11/1/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant); As to: Wendy Chan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Wendy Chan (Defendant); As to: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); DOES 1 TO 20 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wendy Chan (Defendant); As to: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); DOES 1 TO 20 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Wendy Chan (Defendant); As to: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Wendy Chan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Wendy Chan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DDS WOOD WORKING, INC. a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Wendy Chan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DDS WOOD WORKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPERINI EDWARD G