This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 11:40:14 (UTC).

DAWN R. RHYMES VS HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 DAWN R RHYMES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0760

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHYMES DAWN R.

Defendant

HAWTHORNE AUTO SQUARE INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

6/9/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/9/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/9/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

6/9/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/9/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/15/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/26/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/26/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/26/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/1/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/29/2022

7/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/29/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/29/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

9/13/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant) to Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant) to Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/14/2022 ; Status Date changed from 09/13/2022 to 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/14/2022 ; Status Date changed from 09/14/2022 to 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/14/2022 ; Status Date changed from 09/14/2022 to 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Dawn R. Rhymes (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/13/2022 ; Status Date changed from 07/29/2022 to 09/13/2022 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/13/2022 ; Status Date changed from 09/13/2022 to 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Dawn R. Rhymes against Defendant Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Dawn R. Rhymes on 06/09/2022 for the principal amount of $2,925.83 for a total of $2,925.83.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/29/2022 08:30 AM at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Dawn R. Rhymes (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dawn R. Rhymes (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Dawn R. Rhymes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Dawn R. Rhymes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David K. Reinert in Department 1 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Dawn R. Rhymes (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Square Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less