This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 07:29:10 (UTC).

DARRYL PARKER VS BPP EAST UNION SPE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 DARRYL PARKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BPP EAST UNION SPE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2956

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKER DARRYL

Defendants

HUSSON TONY

BPP EAST UNION SPE LLC

21 CHOICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorneys

ORLICK MARTIN HARRY

ROBINSON KEITH

VAUGHAN CRIS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/29/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

10/29/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

10/1/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/23/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

8/23/2021: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

8/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

8/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Set Aside Request for Entry of Default Of Defendant Bpp East Union Spe Llc and [proposed] Order

6/14/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Set Aside Request for Entry of Default Of Defendant Bpp East Union Spe Llc and [proposed] Order

Answer - Answer

6/21/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

5/18/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

5/27/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/13/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/10/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff); As to: BPP East Union SPE LLC (Defendant); 21 Choices LLC (Defendant); Tony Husson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff); As to: BPP East Union SPE LLC (Defendant); 21 Choices LLC (Defendant); Tony Husson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff); As to: BPP East Union SPE LLC (Defendant); 21 Choices LLC (Defendant); Tony Husson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff); As to: BPP East Union SPE LLC (Defendant); 21 Choices LLC (Defendant); Tony Husson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Darryl Parker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21 CHOICES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION is a litigant