This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 00:34:38 (UTC).

DAIONE K JOHNSON VS IN HOUSE AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 DAIONE K JOHNSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IN HOUSE AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4574

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON DAIONE K

Defendants

IN HOUSE AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

SURETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/18/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

9/3/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2024
  • Hearing06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: In House Auto Credit Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/2021; Service Cost: 106.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant) to M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: In House Auto Credit Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/2021; Service Cost: 106.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to M&N Financing Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Daione K Johnson on 06/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: In House Auto Credit Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: In House Auto Credit Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daione K Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA