This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 17:13:08 (UTC).

D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS DEAN MALTZMAN

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 D A CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEAN MALTZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3315

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.A. CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendant

MALTZMAN DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/27/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/27/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2024
  • Hearing04/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DEAN MALTZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to DEAN MALTZMAN; On the Complaint filed by D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. on 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DEAN MALTZMAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/17/2021; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DEAN MALTZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DEAN MALTZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DEAN MALTZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DEAN MALTZMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ETHAN OHAD