This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2022 at 01:50:23 (UTC).

D AND D HOUSING, LLC, ET AL. VS BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 D AND D HOUSING, LLC, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2009

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D AND D HOUSING LLC

DISTEFANO ROBERT

Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/30/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/30/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/30/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/11/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: D and D Housing, LLC (Plaintiff); Robert Distefano (Plaintiff); As to: Bank of America, National Association (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/05/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: D and D Housing, LLC (Plaintiff); Robert Distefano (Plaintiff); As to: Bank of America, National Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant