Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 17:40:09 (UTC).

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES VS CHRISTINE MICHELLE HILL

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHRISTINE MICHELLE HILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3150

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES

Defendant

HILL CHRISTINE MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

4/22/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

4/23/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/21/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/21/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/21/2021: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2024
  • Hearing04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff); As to: Christine Michelle Hill (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/02/2021; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff); As to: Christine Michelle Hill (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff); As to: Christine Michelle Hill (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff); As to: Christine Michelle Hill (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCARTHY DANIEL B.