*******1677
03/13/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
KATHERINE CHILTON
CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY
O G S TRANSPORT
NIVINSKUS MARK
3/13/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint
3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
3/13/2023: Complaint - Complaint
3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
3/13/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests
3/13/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter
3/13/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order
5/9/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Hearing03/16/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service
[-] Read LessHearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: O G S Transport (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 94.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 04/23/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/16/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: O G S Transport (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: O G S Transport (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: O G S Transport (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less