This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:24:13 (UTC).

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY VS EDUARDO ROBLES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDUARDO ROBLES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7588

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ROBLES EDUARDO

ROBLES JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/9/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/9/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

11/9/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/9/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2025
  • Hearing11/12/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2024
  • Hearing05/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Robles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 84.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jeffrey Robles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 84.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/12/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Robles (Defendant); Jeffrey Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Robles (Defendant); Jeffrey Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Robles (Defendant); Jeffrey Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Robles (Defendant); Jeffrey Robles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less