This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 12:20:38 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. (COSTCO ANYWHERE VISA CARD BY CITI) VS OSMIN B VELASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A COSTCO ANYWHERE VISA CARD BY CITI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OSMIN B VELASQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0780

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. COSTCO ANYWHERE VISA CARD BY CITI

Defendant

VELASQUEZ OSMIN B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/12/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

1/12/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

2/14/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2024
  • Hearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Citibank N.A. (Costco Anywhere Visa Card By Citi) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Citibank N.A. (Costco Anywhere Visa Card By Citi) (Plaintiff); As to: Osmin B Velasquez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Citibank N.A. (Costco Anywhere Visa Card By Citi) (Plaintiff); As to: Osmin B Velasquez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Citibank N.A. (Costco Anywhere Visa Card By Citi) (Plaintiff); As to: Osmin B Velasquez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less