This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 20:16:48 (UTC).

CRISTINA EMILY ADAME, ET AL. VS RAUL OJEDA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 CRISTINA EMILY ADAME filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAUL OJEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5020

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ADAME CRISTINA EMILY

CRUZ PEDRO

RECINOS PATRICIA ANTONIA

OJEDA RAUL

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

OJEDA RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMENEZ DANIEL F

Defendant Attorney

MANESH VICTORIA

Cross Defendant Attorney

ARQUELL IVETTA NIKITA

Other Attorneys

PRAGER ERIKA MORGAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/8/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/8/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/8/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

7/8/2021: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/8/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Answer - Answer

11/30/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

11/30/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

1/21/2022: Answer - Answer

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

3/15/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2024
  • Hearing07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Erika Morgan Prager (Attorney): First Name changed from Ivetta to Erika; Last Name changed from Arquell to Prager; Organization Name changed from Law Office of Marvin P. Velastegui to Law Office of Marvin Velastegui (GEICO); Middle Name changed from Nikita to Morgan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAddress for Erika Morgan Prager (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Cristina Emily Adame (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Cristina Emily Adame (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Raul Ojeda (Defendant); As to: Cristina Emily Adame (Plaintiff); Pedro Cruz (Plaintiff); Patricia Antonia Recinos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Raul Ojeda (Defendant); As to: Cristina Emily Adame (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cristina Emily Adame (Plaintiff); Pedro Cruz (Plaintiff); Patricia Antonia Recinos (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Ojeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cristina Emily Adame (Plaintiff); Pedro Cruz (Plaintiff); Patricia Antonia Recinos (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Ojeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cristina Emily Adame (Plaintiff); Pedro Cruz (Plaintiff); Patricia Antonia Recinos (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Ojeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRAGER ERIKA