This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 00:17:45 (UTC).

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LOUIS GEORGE TANGALAKIS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 CRENSHAW LUMBER CO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOUIS GEORGE TANGALAKIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0517

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

SMITH JUSTIN JEFF

TANGALAKIS LOUIS GEORGE AKA LOUIS G TANGALAKIS AKA LOUIS TANGALAKIS INDIVIDUALLY DBA ELIAS CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PARIS KAREN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/7/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 01/13/2022

1/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 01/13/2022

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 01/13/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation on 01/07/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/13/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Louis George Tangalakis (Defendant); Service Date: 04/19/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Louis George Tangalakis (Defendant); Service Date: 05/19/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation on 01/07/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation as to Justin Jeff Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Louis George Tangalakis (Defendant); Justin Jeff Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Louis George Tangalakis (Defendant); Justin Jeff Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crenshaw Lumber Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Louis George Tangalakis (Defendant); Justin Jeff Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crenshaw Lumber Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS AND PARIS LLP - KAREN M. PARIS