This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 15:02:27 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS EW TRADING, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EW TRADING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4258

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

EW TRADING INC. DBA EW PACKAGING AKA EW PACKING

Cross Defendant

PRUDENTIAL OVERALL SUPPLY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

LU TONY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/23/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

8/9/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

8/9/2021: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons - Cross-Complaint

8/9/2021: Summons - Summons - Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/4/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. on 06/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant); As to: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons - Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant); As to: Prudential Overall Supply, a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant); As to: Prudential Overall Supply, a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/25/2021; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EW TRADING, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prudential Overall Supply is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant