This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 22:22:09 (UTC).

CORREY B. AVNER VS SQUARETRADE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 CORREY B AVNER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SQUARETRADE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1365

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVNER CORREY B.

Defendants

SQUARETRADE INC.

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

8/17/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/15/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

8/15/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/18/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/18/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/18/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/22/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/22/2022

11/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/22/2022

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/6/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

12/30/2022: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

12/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest -

1/4/2023: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Summary; Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff); Costs: 228.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketRequest to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CORREY B. AVNER against Defendant SQUARETRADE, INC., Defendant ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY and Defendant ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by CORREY B. AVNER on 08/15/2022 for the principal amount of $4,956.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $5,031.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/22/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by CORREY B. AVNER on 08/15/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 10/18/2022; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff); As to: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant); Service Cost: 51.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff); As to: SQUARETRADE, INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 96.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff); As to: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); Service Cost: 81.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff); As to: SQUARETRADE, INC. (Defendant); ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CORREY B. AVNER (Plaintiff); As to: SQUARETRADE, INC. (Defendant); ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SquareTrade Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant