This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 16:19:25 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS YESENYA HEREDIA

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YESENYA HEREDIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3208

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

HEREDIA YESENYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE CALVIN F.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/13/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/13/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

6/13/2022: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: YESENYA HEREDIA (Defendant); Service Date: 06/20/2022; Service Cost: 84.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: YESENYA HEREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: YESENYA HEREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: YESENYA HEREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: YESENYA HEREDIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE CALVIN F.