This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 17:19:52 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS ROSA A. BRAVO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSA A BRAVO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6805

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

BRAVO ROSA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE CALVIN F

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

10/14/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/14/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/10/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/27/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/27/2021

10/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/27/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROSA A. BRAVO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROSA A. BRAVO (Defendant); Service Date: 10/23/2021; Service Cost: 84.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Karen Moskowitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/27/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Randy Rhodes; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROSA A. BRAVO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROSA A. BRAVO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROSA A. BRAVO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROSA A. BRAVO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant