This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2022 at 07:11:54 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS ERICKA CHILDS

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERICKA CHILDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

CHILDS ERICKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE CALVIN F

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

5/13/2022: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Complaint - Complaint

5/13/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/13/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/24/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Karen Moskowitz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ERICKA CHILDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ERICKA CHILDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ERICKA CHILDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ERICKA CHILDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE CALVIN F.