This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 14:09:19 (UTC).

CLINTON GLEN CRISHER VS U.S. BANCORP CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 CLINTON GLEN CRISHER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against U S BANCORP CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2073

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRISHER CLINTON GLEN

Defendants

U.S. BANCORP A CORPORATION

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AKA US BANK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/31/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/31/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/31/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

6/13/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

7/14/2022: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/14/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

7/14/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/14/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/14/2022: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/14/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

7/13/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/13/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

7/13/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

7/22/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/10/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Clinton Glen Crisher on 05/31/2022 as follows: Defendants U.S. Bancorp, A Corporation; US Bank, National Association AKA US Bank do not owe the plaintiff Clinton Glen Crisher any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 08/10/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff); As to: US Bank, National Association (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: U.S. Bancorp, A Corporation (Defendant); US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from U.S. Bancorp, A Corporation (Defendant), US Bank, National Association (Defendant) to U.S. Bancorp, A Corporation (Defendant), US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bancorp Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 06/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bancorp Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Clinton Glen Crisher (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bancorp, A Corporation (Defendant); US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bancorp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant