This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2023 at 08:18:20 (UTC).

CLEAN SWEEP GROUP INC. VS MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 CLEAN SWEEP GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0274

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN SWEEP GROUP INC.

Defendant

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/8/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/8/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/8/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/27/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/27/2023

3/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/27/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/27/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CLEAN SWEEP GROUP INC. on 02/08/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CLEAN SWEEP GROUP INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/22/2023; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CLEAN SWEEP GROUP INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant) to MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant) to MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Defendant) to MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL to MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less