This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 02:30:01 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER ITS CHARTER AND THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS BRUNSTEN MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER ITS CHARTER AND THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against BRUNSTEN MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7178

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER ITS CHARTER AND THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY FACILITIES DISTRICT NO. 4 PLAYA VISTA-PHASE 1

Defendant

BRUNSTEN MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/1/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/1/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/1/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/1/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation organized and existing under its charter and the laws of the State of California, on behalf of the City of Los Angeles Community Facilities District No. 4 (Playa Vista-Phase 1) (Plaintiff); As to: BRUNSTEN MANAGEMENT LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation organized and existing under its charter and the laws of the State of California, on behalf of the City of Los Angeles Community Facilities District No. 4 (Playa Vista-Phase 1) (Plaintiff); As to: BRUNSTEN MANAGEMENT LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation organized and existing under its charter and the laws of the State of California, on behalf of the City of Los Angeles Community Facilities District No. 4 (Playa Vista-Phase 1) (Plaintiff); As to: BRUNSTEN MANAGEMENT LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P