Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 07:26:26 (UTC).

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. VS ROGER A CRUZ

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA , N A filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROGER A CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0444

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A.

Defendant

CRUZ ROGER A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment

2/9/2021: Judgment - Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

2/9/2021: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment On Sister-State Judgment

2/9/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment On Sister-State Judgment

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/9/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties: Roger A Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties: Roger A Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David J. Cowan in Department 1 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Roger A Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Roger A Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Entry Of Judgment On Sister-State Judgment; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Roger A Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. against Defendant Roger A Cruz on the Petition filed by CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. on 02/09/2021 for the principal amount of $7,156.33 and costs of $225.00 for a total of $7,381.33.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citibank South Dakota NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ANTHONY DIPIERO