This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 12:39:59 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS MARIA MONTANO

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA MONTANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6847

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MONTANO MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISOZAKI RYOTA

Defendant Attorney

MARCH DANIEL S.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

11/16/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Answer - Answer

11/15/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Maria Montano (Defendant); As to: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Montano (Defendant); Service Date: 10/28/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Montano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Montano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Montano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer March, Daniel S.