This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 00:18:25 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS ISABEL RIVAS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISABEL RIVAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2884

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

CITIBANK N.A.

RIVAS ISABEL

HUNT & HENRIQUES INC.

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

RIVAS ISABEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALZER CARR ALEXANDER

Other Attorneys

HUMPHREYS SCOTT S.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/2/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/2/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/2/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

3/10/2023: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

3/10/2023: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

4/18/2023: Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

7/3/2023: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

7/10/2023: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2024
  • Hearing02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties changed from CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff) to Hunt & Henriques, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties changed from CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff) to Isabel Rivas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Isabel Rivas (Cross-Complainant); As to: CITIBANK N.A. (Cross-Defendant); Hunt & Henriques, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Isabel Rivas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Isabel Rivas (Defendant); As to: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Rivas (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Rivas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Rivas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Isabel Rivas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less