Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 14:56:25 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS DENNIS V MAGADIA

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DENNIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1994

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MAGADIA DENNIS V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN CARINA M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/3/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/3/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • Hearing06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Dennis V Magadia (Defendant); Service Date: 06/13/2021; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Dennis V Magadia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Dennis V Magadia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CITIBANK N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Dennis V Magadia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Dennis V Magadia (Defendant) to Dennis V Magadia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan, Carina M