This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 16:08:05 (UTC).

CIRCA 1200, LLC VS SUZANNA PARRA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 CIRCA 1200, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUZANNA PARRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6935

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIRCA 1200 LLC

Defendant

PARRA SUZANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/18/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/18/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/18/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2025
  • Hearing10/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2024
  • Hearing04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanna Parra (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/21/2022; Service Cost: 58.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanna Parra (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanna Parra (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Circa 1200, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Suzanna Parra (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant